Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hussman, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Dawn O. Bittleston presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time1705 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 7/16/19 DIV B Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing HRG 7/16/19 DIV B Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
July 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification)
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD. CS, HC, STANDARD ORDERS Hearing Date: 7/16/19 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD. CS, HC, STANDARD ORDERS Hearing Date: 7/16/19 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
October 19, 2016 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
October 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification)
Judge: Glennon, Donald P., Jr. |
|
August 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD. CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS/$0 SUPPORT Hearing Date: 10/4/16 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: MOD. CS/HC/STANDARD ORDERS/$0 SUPPORT Hearing Date: 10/4/16 Hearing Time: 9:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR |
|
April 17, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Initial DPG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.