Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patrick, Chris, Patrick, Jessica, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lien, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time2178 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 03, 2011 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied BALANCE OWED $3,055.88 |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied BALANCE OWED $3,055.88 |
|
July 10, 2008 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
May 05, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for RUSSELL, MICHAEL D. (AS-1). Received from HERBERT P. SEARS CO., INC., check no(s) 130569. Receipt #385631 for amount of $15.00. |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for RUSSELL, MICHAEL D. (AS-1). Received from HERBERT P. SEARS CO., INC., check no(s) 130569. Receipt #385631 for amount of $15.00. |
|
May 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN COUNTY |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN COUNTY |
|
May 01, 2008 | Hearing |
Assignment of Judgment MICHAEL D. RUSSELL ATTORNEY AT LAW P.O. BOX 1231 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.