Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Quintanilla, Melissa T., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management60 days |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2012 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
October 07, 2010 | Hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from LEGAL RECOVERHY LAW OFFICE, check no(s) 190083. Receipt #552003 for amount of $25.00. |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from LEGAL RECOVERHY LAW OFFICE, check no(s) 190083. Receipt #552003 for amount of $25.00. |
|
October 04, 2010 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
October 04, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
September 03, 2010 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:MANN BRACKEN NEW ATTORNEY:MARK WALSH |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:MANN BRACKEN NEW ATTORNEY:MARK WALSH |
|
September 10, 2007 | Hearing |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from ESKANOS & ADLER, P.C. ATTORNEYS AT LAW, check no(s) 012039. Receipt #338081 for amount of $15.00. |
|
September 10, 2007 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from ESKANOS & ADLER, P.C. ATTORNEYS AT LAW, check no(s) 012039. Receipt #338081 for amount of $15.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.