Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herbert P. Sears Co., Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Russell, Michael D, against Cross, Linda M., Cross, Victor A., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Catherine D. Purcell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine D. Purcell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management60 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1212 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2010 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied REMAINING BALANCE $21,572.32 |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied REMAINING BALANCE $21,572.32 |
|
March 28, 2008 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
January 25, 2008 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
July 27, 2007 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for HERBERT P. SEARS CO., INC. (PL-1). Received from HERBERT P. SEARS CO.,INC, check no(s) 120871. Receipt #328169 for amount of $15.00. |
|
July 27, 2007 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY |
|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY |
|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for HERBERT P. SEARS CO., INC. (PL-1). Received from HERBERT P. SEARS CO.,INC, check no(s) 120871. Receipt #328169 for amount of $15.00. |
|
July 23, 2007 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs and Credits | |
July 13, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment New Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.