Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Afra, Karen K, against Bonilla, Ruth, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Kenneth G. Pritchard presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management374 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions416 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time416 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1435 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE PLAINTIFF HAVING BEEN SERVED WITH NOTICE THAT THE MATTER MAY BE DISMISSED IF CAUSE WAS NOT SHOWN WHY PLAINTIFF FAILED TO PROSECUTE THE MATTER AND/OR FAILED TO APPEAR AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, THE COURT ORDERS THE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Hearing |
4145 Further Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
4145 Further Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP1435 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE PLAINTIFF HAVING BEEN SERVED WITH NOTICE THAT THE MATTER MAY BE DISMISSED IF CAUSE WAS NOT SHOWN WHY PLAINTIFF FAILED TO PROSECUTE THE MATTER AND/OR FAILED TO APPEAR AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, THE COURT ORDERS THE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
July 19, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice of Order to Appear NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO ATTEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND/OR FAILUE TO SUBMIT A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON AUGUST 20,2010 AT 10:00AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY UNLESS 4 DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AN ANSWER, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CONVERTING THE ACTION TO AN ORDINARY CIVIL ACTION, A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, A STIPULATED JUDGMENT OR STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. IF THERE IS A FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT INTENDS TO DISMISS THE CASE. THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS TRAILED WITH THIS OSC. THE PLAINTIFF MAY APPEAR BY COURT CALL FOR THE HERAING. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO ATTEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND/OR FAILUE TO SUBMIT A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON AUGUST 20,2010 AT 10:00AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY UNLESS 4 DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AN ANSWER, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CONVERTING THE ACTION TO AN ORDINARY CIVIL ACTION, A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, A STIPULATED JUDGMENT OR STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. IF THERE IS A FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT INTENDS TO DISMISS THE CASE. THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS TRAILED WITH THIS OSC. THE PLAINTIFF MAY APPEAR BY COURT CALL FOR THE HERAING. |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Appear NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO ATTEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND/OR FAILUE TO SUBMIT A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON AUGUST 20,2010 AT 10:00AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY UNLESS 4 DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AN ANSWER, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CONVERTING THE ACTION TO AN ORDINARY CIVIL ACTION, A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, A STIPULATED JUDGMENT OR STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. IF THERE IS A FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT INTENDS TO DISMISS THE CASE. THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS TRAILED WITH THIS OSC. THE PLAINTIFF MAY APPEAR BY COURT CALL FOR THE HERAING. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO ATTEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND/OR FAILUE TO SUBMIT A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON AUGUST 20,2010 AT 10:00AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY UNLESS 4 DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AN ANSWER, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CONVERTING THE ACTION TO AN ORDINARY CIVIL ACTION, A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, A STIPULATED JUDGMENT OR STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. IF THERE IS A FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT INTENDS TO DISMISS THE CASE. THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS TRAILED WITH THIS OSC. THE PLAINTIFF MAY APPEAR BY COURT CALL FOR THE HERAING. |
|
July 09, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1430 Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT ORDERS THE CLERK TO ISSUE PLAINTIFF AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO ATTEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, FTP AND/OR FAILURE TO SUBMIT A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY UNLESS 4 DAYS PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AN ANSWER, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING, AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CONVERTING THE ACTION TO AN ORDINARY CIVIL ACTION, A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, A STIPULATED JUDGMENT OR STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. IF THERE IS A FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, THE COURT INTENDS TO DISMISS THE CASE. THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS TO BE TRAILED WITH THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. THE CLERK IS TO INCLUDE A PROVISION ON THE NOTICE THAT THE PLAINTIFF MAY APPEAR BY PHONE. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 08/20/2010 AT 10:00 AM FOR SANCTIONS AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
July 09, 2010 | Hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
July 09, 2010 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.