Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
1402 Alta Vista Partners, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Peake, Alan J, against Funchess, Regina, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Catherine D. Purcell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine D. Purcell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management35 days |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions12 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time77 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2008 | Hearing |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
March 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment New Notice |
|
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment New Notice |
|
March 24, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Court DATE RECORDED: 3/25/08 DOCUMENT NO: BOOK XXXVIII PAGE: 16 JUDGMENT FOR: PLAINTIFF JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEFENDANTS PAST DUE RENT: $450.00 HOLDOVER DAMAGES: $600.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $290.00 COSTS: $375.00 LATE FEE: $50.00 TOTAL: $1765.00 JUDGE CATHERINE D PURCELL |
|
March 24, 2008 | Hearing | Declaration for Default | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Court DATE RECORDED: 3/25/08 DOCUMENT NO: BOOK XXXVIII PAGE: 16 JUDGMENT FOR: PLAINTIFF JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEFENDANTS PAST DUE RENT: $450.00 HOLDOVER DAMAGES: $600.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $290.00 COSTS: $375.00 LATE FEE: $50.00 TOTAL: $1765.00 JUDGE CATHERINE D PURCELL |
|
March 18, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
March 17, 2008 | Hearing | Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered | |
March 17, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) DISMISSED AS TO DOES ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.