Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cunningham, Daniel, Villalovos, Martin Guzman, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen M. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen M. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
CategorySubstituted Judgment/ Special Needs Trust Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66267881) FILED BY ATTORNEY URBATSCH, KEVIN P
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER VILLALOVOS, MARTIN GUZMAN
Date: August 18, 2020ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER CUNNINGHAM, DANIEL
Date: August 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Hearing |
FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
September 12, 2023 | Hearing |
FUTURE ACCOUNTING
Judge: STEPHEN M. MURPHY |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | FUTURE ACCOUNTING CONTINUED FROM SEP-12-2023 TO OCT-17-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68157728) FILED BY PETITIONER CUNNINGHAM, DANIEL | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER CUNNINGHAM, DANIEL | |
August 09, 2022 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF AUG-09-2022, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. BOND IS REDUCED TO $241,000. CONTINUED FROM AUG-09-2022 TO SEP-12-2023 AT 09:00 AM FOR FUTURE ACCOUNTING | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 67881591) FILED BY PETITIONER CUNNINGHAM, DANIEL | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67881591) FILED BY PETITIONER CUNNINGHAM, DANIEL | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TRUSTEE; PETITION TO SETTLE ACCOUNT; TO REDUCE BOND; AND TO FIX AND ALLOW TRUSTEES FEES AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67881591) FILED BY PETITIONER CUNNINGHAM, DANIEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.