Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bradley, Christine Marie, Schneider, Christian, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul H. Alvarado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2016 |
CategoryTrust (Petition For Order Determining Trust'S Title To Real Property) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SCHNEIDER, CHRISTIAN BRADLEY, CHRISTINE MARIE
Date: April 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING TRUST'S TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY FILED BY TRUSTEE SCHNEIDER, CHRISTIAN BRADLEY, CHRISTINE MARIE | |
June 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Determining Trust'S Title To Real Property
Judge: PAUL H. ALVARADO |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (4 PAGE, 2 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY TRUSTEE SCHNEIDER, CHRISTIAN BRADLEY, CHRISTINE MARIE | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUST'S TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY, CALENDAR OF JUN-15-2016, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
May 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Determining Trust'S Title To Real Property
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUST'S TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY CONTINUED FROM MAY-31-2016 TO JUN-15-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
May 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Petition For Order Determining Trust'S Title To Real Property
Judge: ANDREW Y.S. CHENG |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUST'S TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY CONTINUED FROM MAY-16-2016 TO MAY-31-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETITIONERS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY (HEGGSTAD PETITION) (TRANSACTION ID # 59002602) FILED BY PETITIONER SCHNEIDER, CHRISTIAN BRADLEY, CHRISTINE MARIE | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER SCHNEIDER, CHRISTIAN BRADLEY, CHRISTINE MARIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.