Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Community Music Center, Steinmetz, Kristin, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Peter J. Busch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2014 |
CategoryTrust (Verified Petition For Appointment Of Successor Trustee) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1647 days |
This complaint is a statement of non-opposition to an amendment to a petition to modify a charitable disposition based on changed circumstances. The Attorney General of California has reviewed the amendment filed by Community Music Center and has no ...
NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 59858116) FILED BY PETITIONER COMMUNITY MUSIC CENTER
Date: November 18, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 60130795) FILED BY PETITIONER COMMUNITY MUSIC CENTER
Date: January 27, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 56160272) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN
Date: October 07, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 59737186) FILED BY PETITIONER COMMUNITY MUSIC CENTER
Date: October 24, 2016ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLCIATION TO REDUCE BOND
Date: April 05, 2019ORDER APPOINTING TRUSTEE [SUCCESSOR] STEINMETZ, KRISTIN APPOINTED
Date: January 29, 2015ORDER MODIFYING CHARITABLE DISPOSITION TRUST
Date: March 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND FILED BY SURETY COMPANY U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLCIATION TO REDUCE BOND | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 63120796) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DANIEL R. MARCH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 63120796) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KRISTIN STEINMETZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 63120796) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF AUDREY BRETTHAUER COHEN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 63120796) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KRISTIN STEINMETZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 62946629) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JENNIFER GADBERRY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 62946629) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 62946629) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GARY ALABASTER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REDUCE BOND (TRANSACTION ID # 62946629) FILED BY PETITIONER STEINMETZ, KRISTIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.