Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Mary E. Wiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2007 |
CategoryTrust (Petition For Instructions Regarding Trust Investments And For Addition Of Trustee Removal And Replacement Provision) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time1299 days |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: September 29, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: November 02, 2010ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM [EX PARTE]
Date: December 10, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: September 27, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: September 28, 2007CONSENT BY TRUST BENEFICIARY TO MODIFY TRUST (3) FILED BY PETITIONER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: November 02, 2010DECLARATION BY TRUSTEE RE VALUE OF TRUST ASSETS FILED BY PETITIONER BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: December 08, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER MODIFYING TRUSTEE TO CLARIFY TRUSTEE INVESTMENT AUTHORITY, MODIFYING LIMITATION ON TRUSTEE COMPENSATION, RATIFYING PRIOR FUTURE CHANGE OF SITUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND GOVERNING LAW | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY TRUST TO CLARIFY TRUSTEE INVESTMENT AUTHORITY, MODIFY LIMITATION ON TRUSTEE COMPENSATION, RATIFY PRIOR INVESTMENTS, AND PERMIT FUTURE CHANGE OF SITUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND GOVERNING LAW, CALENDAR OF MAR-30-2011, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED. | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY TRUST TO CLARIFY TRUSTEE INVESTMENT AUTHORITY, MODIFY LIMITATION ON TRUSTEE COMPENSATION, RATIFY PRIOR INVESTMENTS, AND PERMIT FUTURE CHANGE OF SITUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND GOVERNING LAW, CALENDAR OF MAR-30-2011, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAR-30-2011 | |
March 30, 2011 | Hearing |
Petition To Modify Trust To Clarify Trustee Investment Authority, Modify Limitation On Trustee Compensation, Ratify Prior Investments, And Permit Future Change Of Situs Of Administration And Governing Law
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY TRUST TO CLARIFY TRUSTEE INVESTMENT AUTHORITY, MODIFY LIMITATION ON TRUSTEE COMPENSATION, RATIFY PRIOR INVESTMENTS, AND PERMIT FUTURE CHANGE OF SITUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND GOVERNING LAW CONTINUED FROM MAR-16-2011 TO MAR-30-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
March 16, 2011 | Hearing |
Petition To Modify Trust To Clarify Trustee Investment Authority, Modify Limitation On Trustee Compensation, Ratify Prior Investments, And Permit Future Change Of Situs Of Administration And Governing Law
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY TRUST TO CLARIFY TRUSTEE INVESTMENT AUTHORITY, MODIFY LIMITATION ON TRUSTEE COMPENSATION, RATIFY PRIOR INVESTMENTS, AND PERMIT FUTURE CHANGE OF SITUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND GOVERNING LAW CONTINUED FROM MAR-02-2011 TO MAR-16-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
March 02, 2011 | Hearing |
Petition To Modify Trust To Clarify Trustee Investment Authority, Modify Limitation On Trustee Compensation, Ratify Prior Investments, And Permit Future Change Of Situs Of Administration And Governing Law
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR FEB-16-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 204 | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY TRUST TO CLARIFY TRUSTEE INVESTMENT AUTHORITY, MODIFY LIMITATION ON TRUSTEE COMPENSATION, RATIFY PRIOR INVESTMENTS, AND PERMIT FUTURE CHANGE OF SITUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND GOVERNING LAW CONTINUED FROM FEB-16-2011 TO MAR-02-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.