Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Calandra, Julie, Calandra, Sharon, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Dearman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2006 |
CategoryTrust (Petition To Remove Trustee And Appoint Successor T) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time207 days |
AMENDED PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF UNDER P.C.S. 21320
Date: December 22, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER CALANDRA, JULIE CALANDRA, SHARON
Date: September 29, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER CALANDRA, JULIE CALANDRA, SHARON
Date: November 17, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER CALANDRA, JULIE CALANDRA, SHARON
Date: December 22, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER CALANDRA, JULIE CALANDRA, SHARON
Date: October 11, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2007 | Hearing |
For Declaratory Relief Under Probate Code
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event | FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF UNDER PROBATE CODE, CALENDAR OF APR-24-2007, OFF CALENDAR PER CALANDRA, JULIE | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (PETN. FOR DECL. RELIEF UNDER PROBATE CODE 21320) | |
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION (WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY PETITIONER CALANDRA, JULIE CALANDRA, SHARON | |
April 02, 2007 | Hearing |
For Declaratory Relief Under Probate Code
Judge: DOROTHY L. MCMATH |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF UNDER PROBATE CODE CONTINUED FROM APR-02-2007 TO APR-24-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
February 20, 2007 | Hearing |
For Declaratory Relief Under Probate Code
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event | FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF UNDER PROBATE CODE CONTINUED FROM FEB-20-2007 TO APR-02-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT | |
January 23, 2007 | Hearing |
For Declaratory Relief Under Probate Code
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event | FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF UNDER PROBATE CODE CONTINUED FROM JAN-23-2007 TO FEB-20-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.