Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tondu, Ruby, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Sue M. Kaplan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2006 |
CategoryTrust (Ex Parte Petition For Order Bringing Trust) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2460 days |
This complaint is a legal document related to the Douglas Hom 2006 Revocable Trust. It is a first amendment to the trust, executed by Douglas Hom on a specified date. The amendment includes changes to various sections of the trust, such as the recita...
ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (ISIDOOR BORNSTEIN) FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: September 09, 2010ORDER AUTHORIZING TRUSTEE TO LIST AND SELL THE TRUSTS REAL PROPERTY
Date: July 06, 2010INCREASED BID IN OPEN COURT FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: October 13, 2010PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE RECORDER)
Date: July 27, 2010PROOF OF POSTING OF NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: September 09, 2010RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: November 30, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: June 28, 2011ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: September 10, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: September 17, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: July 10, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: June 27, 2011THE DOUGLAS HOM 2006 REVOCABLE TRUST
Date: April 17, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: May 07, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: July 12, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: June 19, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: April 17, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: May 10, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: June 18, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: September 10, 2010FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE DOUGLAS HOM 2006 REVOCABLE TRUST FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: August 02, 2011EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: January 10, 2013TRUSTEE'S BRING-DOWN ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: December 21, 2012ORIGINAL BANK STATEMENTS IN SUPPORT OF TRUSTEE'S FIRST ACCOUNT
Date: July 10, 2007ORDER [EX PARTE] AUTHORIZING TRUSTEE TO HIRE PAINTING CONTRACTORS
Date: September 29, 2008ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY
Date: October 13, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE: FORMER TRUSTEE'S BRING-DOWN ACCOUNTING. FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | TRUSTEE'S BRING-DOWN ACCOUNTING FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES [ORDER TERMINATING COURT SUPERVISION] FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY | |
August 16, 2011 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES, CALENDAR OF AUG-16-2011, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE DOUGLAS HOM 2006 REVOCABLE TRUST FILED BY PETITIONER TONDU, RUBY | |
August 02, 2011 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES
Judge: MARY E. WISS |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #3, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM AUG-02-2011 TO AUG-16-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.