Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GARCIA vs CORDOVA
An Unlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Kira L. Klatchko presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 22, 2020
Last Refreshed
April 17, 2022
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Unlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c)) |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file trial setting declaration |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Document Return. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Fee Deposit |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte re: Application for order extending time to service and Order continuing Case Management Conference on Complaint of DIANA GARCIA |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint of GARCIA and filed. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS1. (Palm Springs) |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92203. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs) |
|
August 26, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)as toDIANA GARCIA, MOVA LAW GROUP APLC, ALFREDO OLIVER Vacated Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
August 26, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing TSC Set Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
July 29, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)as toDIANA GARCIA, MOVA LAW GROUP APLC, ALFREDO OLIVER Continued Hearing Not Held Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
July 29, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Continued Hearing Not Held Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
May 14, 2020 | hearing |
Court on its Own Motion Complete Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
April 27, 2020 | hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Continued Hearing Not Held Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
April 26, 2020 | hearing |
Court on its Own Motion Complete Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
April 18, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c) Vacated Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
February 22, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c) Vacated Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
February 22, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file trial setting declaration as toMOVA LAW GROUP APLC, Scott Brian Spriggs Vacated Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
February 22, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference Vacated Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
February 22, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file trial setting declaration as toMOVA LAW GROUP APLC, Scott Brian Spriggs
Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |
|
February 22, 2020 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Kira L. Klatchko |