Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sergio Navarro, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ali Reza Moghaddami, against Ernest Higgins, represented by Edwin Salgado, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Kira L. Klatchko presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: October 20, 2021Answer to Complaint on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to comply with CRC 3.724 & LR 3.218
Date: June 29, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: December 06, 2021Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: October 05, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92201.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of NAVARRO and filed.
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS1. (Palm Springs)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of SERGIO NAVARRO
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.