Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Boonsieng Benjauthrit, Julie Millinger, Rodney D.H. Lankford And Geraldine Lankford, Trustees Of The Rodney D. H. Lankford And Geraldine L. Lankford Revocable Trust Dated November 30, 2003, Veena Benjauthrit, Tnt Management Llc, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Brian Stuart Harnik, Roemer & Harnik Llp, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Real Property Located At 40-215 Harris Lane, 40-221 Harris Lane, And 40-225 Harris Lane, Palm Desert, Ca 92211, Christine Nania, Trustee Of The Lakehouse Trust Dated February 3, 1999, Denise L. Avery, Married Individuals, Doreen L. Christiensen, Government Employees Financial Corporation, (total of 23) See All in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with David M. Chapman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Real Property Located At 40-215 Harris Lane, 40-221 Harris Lane, And 40-225 Harris Lane, Palm Desert, Ca 92211
Amended Order of Dismissal
Date: December 21, 2023Order of Dismissal
Date: December 13, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: December 21, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: December 13, 2023Judgment
Date: July 06, 2023Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove Up
Date: July 06, 2023Request for Dismissal on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: July 03, 2023Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: July 03, 2023Request for Dismissal on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2023-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause
Date: 2023-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Trial Date and Related Rulings
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal on Cross Complaint of RODNEY D.H. LANKFORD AND GERALDINE L
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Comply with Local Rule 3401 and PS2 Trial Rules
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Declaration of the Courts Hearing on Septement 19, 2022
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Declaration to Amend Cross-Complaint Filed May 3, 2021 and File a New Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of remote appearance on Cross-Complaint of BOONSIENG BENJAUTHRIT
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Joint Declaration re Trial Setting Conference Pursuant to Rule 10 of Law Motion Case Management Rules
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Publication on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Joint Declaration Re Trial Setting Conference Pursuant to Rule 10 of Law & Motion Case Management Rules
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance - OSC re Sanctions 03/21/2022 on Cross-Complaint of BOONSIENG BENJAUTHRIT
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Amended Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: October 22, 2021 Trial Setting Conference and Order to Show Cause
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Ruling re trial setting conference
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: Trial Setting Conference 9/08/2021
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration of Stephen Armstrong Re Mediation Completion
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of BOONSIENG BENJAUTHRIT
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST - CLASS MAIL - CIVIL on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration of Garrett Heckman for Order to show cause Re Service of all defendants
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Affidavit of Publication 01/29/2021 on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration of Garrett A Heckman for Order to Show Cause RE: Service of all Defendants
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by First-Class Mail-Civi on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by First-Class Mail-Civil on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by First - Class Mail - Civil on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by First -Class Mail-Civil on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: Case Management Conference, Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration of Garrett A Heckman for Order to Show Cause RE: Service of all Defendants
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Declaration of Stephen Fernandez RE: Order to Show Cause RE: Service of all Defendants
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons is Granted; Honorable Judge David M Chapman
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:002 Application and Order for Publication
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Declaration of Stephen Fernandez in support of Application for Order for Service by Publication
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT-5065 HOLLYWOOD BLVD #205 on S.TANEKSUK filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT-147 W 101ST on CORNELL MCNUTT-MARRIED INDIVIDUALS filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT-5909 CRENSHAW BLVD on CORNELL MCNUTT MARRIED INDIVIDUALS filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT-1730 COPPERLEAF CT on SERVITA LOYA MARRIED INDIVIDUALS filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT-7589 MERLIN ST on BRIAN H.CORRAL TRUSTEE filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT-2275 W 25TH ST #170 on ROY H.GAMMELL MARRIED INDIVIDUALS filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Attempted Service of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT-425 LACONIA BLVD on PERRY BOYD filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Supplemental DECL OF GARRETT A HECKMAN FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration of GARRETT A HECKMAN FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Declaration of Garrett A Heckmann for Order to Show Cause Re Service to All Def's filed
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on MARTIN A.LUBER served 03/21/20 Filed (non-complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on ELMER E.KELLOG served 03/10/20 Filed (non-complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on DAVID T.CHU served 03/15/20 Filed (non-complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:001st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC filed. (Amended Complaint - Superior Court)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEMURRER filed
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Court's ruling on Demurrer to Complaint of TNT Management LLC dated 08/12/20.
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 08/12/20.
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Opposition to DEF MOTION TO STRIKE by PLAINTIFF filed
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Opposition to DEFENDANTS DEMURRER by PLAINTIFF filed
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF RODNEY D.H.LANKFORD AND GERALDINE L.LANKFORD TRUSTEE
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Errata/Notice of Errata filed by TNT MANAGEMENT LLC.
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees filed by RODNEY D.H. LANKFORD AND GERALDINE L (Form FW-001).
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by RODNEY D.H. LANKFORD AND GERALDINE L
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT of RODNEY D.H. LANKFORD AND GERALDINE L represented by PRO/PER filed (SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Declaration of GARRETT A HECKMAN FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE OF ALL DEFENDANTS filed
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 15 to be RICHARD REILAND filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 16 to be ROBERT REILAND filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 13 to be BRADLEY GENCO filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 14 to be MICHAEL REILAND filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 10 to be JOANNE BAITY filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 12 to be STEVEN BORDERS filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 9 to be PAMELA A BUSKUS filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 11 to be MICHAEL BORDERS filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: Case Management Conference, Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Declaration of Garrett Heckman Re Order to show Cause
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by First - Class Mail - Civil on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 8 to be NANCY A MCKENNA filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 5 to be PATRICK VINCENT BURKE filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 7 to be CAROL A NOVAK BORDERS filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 4 to be ALEXANDER G GENNARO filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 6 to be HARLEY A BORDERS filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order: Continuance of 5/7/20 Order to Show Cause and Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92211.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice (LIS PENDENS) OF PENDENCY OF ACTION by TNT MANAGEMENT LLC filed.
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC and filed.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 2 to be MICHAEL D LARSON filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 1 to be KENYA DELGADO filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC Naming Does 3 to be STEPHEN WILLIAM LARSON filed.
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on HAL D.MAULDIN served 03/15/20 Filed (non-complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST - CLASS MAIL - CIVIL
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by First - Class Mail - Civil
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons on 1st Amended Complaint of TNT MANAGEMENT LLC
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.