Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arp 2014-1 Borrower Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by H.G. Long & Associates, against Gabriela Montano, Josue Montano, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Lawrence W. Fry presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ps)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time131 days |
UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: July 26, 2019HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/24/19 AT 8:00 IN CUD
Date: July 26, 2019COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: July 26, 2019CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS4 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: July 26, 2019CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92203.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2019 OF ARP 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AND FILED.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/04/19.
Date: December 04, 2019JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY FILED.
Date: December 04, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 12/04/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS4
Date: October 29, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES AND NOTICE FILED.
Date: October 29, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.