Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carlynn Nikhol Graham, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Irvine Law Group Llp, against Glenda Faye Battiste-Otto, Afn Of California Incorporated, represented by Callas & Heise, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Ronald L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: November 30, 2021Stipulation and Order re: settlement
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: November 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause
Date: July 09, 2021Minute Order: Court Trial (Trailing)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order: Court Trial (Trailing)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00W Steven Heise's PreTrial Good Faith Declaration
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Joint Witness List - Amended
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Joint Timeline of Trial
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List - Amended
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Defendant's Trial Brief
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Undisputed facts and/or issues
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Defendant's trial Brief "Table of Contents" on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Joint Pretrial Statement
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Trial Brief on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Joint Timeline of Trial
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Rod Bidgoli's Pre Trial Good Faith Declaration
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Joint Witness List
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Motion in Limine No 1
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine re: No 1 to Exclude Evidence of Spreadsheets and Declaration of Rod
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation RE: Defendants' Second Amended Answer on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:001st Amended Answer on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Motion for leave to file Second Amended Answer
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order: Motion for leave to file Second Amended Answer
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Leave
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Notice of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Leave to file Second Amended Answer
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Motion for leave to file Second Amended Answer Answer on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order: Court Ruling re:
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Ex Parte
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration Regarding Notice of Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Response to Opposition to Notice of Motion
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion to file Second Amended Answer
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Remote Trial Setting Order; Honorable Judge David M Chapman
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Change of Address for Attorney Office in support of Opposition
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 01/14/2020.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement by AFN OF CALIFORNIA INCORPORATED filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint of GRAHAM by AFN OF CALIFORNIA INCORPORATED, GLENDA FAYE BATTISTE-OTTO filed
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication on Complaint of CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Continuance of Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement by CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92262.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of GRAHAM and filed.
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00170.6 CCP filed by CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM against Judge Craig G. Riemer is denied.
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY AFN CALIFORNIA
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/15/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/14/2020.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANTS
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER SUBMITTED BY AFN OF CALIFORNIA INCORPORATED, GLENDA FAYE BATTISTE-OTTO.
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 1/14/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT 01
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY AFN OF CALIFORNIA INCORPORATED FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00170.6 CCP FILED BY CARLYNN NIKHOL GRAHAM AGAINST JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER IS DENIED.
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANTS
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2019 OF CARLYNN GRAHAM AND FILED.
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER SUBMITTED BY AFN OF CALIFORNIA INCORPORATED, GLENDA FAYE BATTISTE-OTTO.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.