We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Charlene Ann Marshal ,
filed a(n)
General Criminal -
Criminal
case
against
District Attorney ,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
with Charles E. Stafford, Jr. presiding.
Judge
Charles E. Stafford, Jr.
Filing Date
April 26, 2019
Category
Petn-For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A&Nbsp;
Last Refreshed
October 24, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
24 days
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Matter Type
General Criminal
Other Parties
3661 (Case Number-criminal Case)
Arredondo, David (Attorney)
Law Office Of Renee Garcia (Attorney)
Case Events for
Charlene Ann Marshal v. District Attorney
Date
Type
Description
June 06, 2019
Docket Event
MANUAL SUBSEQUENT 8715 COMPLETED. Not Applicable
Get Document
June 06, 2019
Docket Event
MANUAL 8715 SENT TO DOJ. Not Applicable
Get Document
May 20, 2019
Hearing
HEARING RE: PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PC 1203.4 (NON APPEARANCE) Completed
May 20, 2019
Docket Event
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE CHARLES E STAFFORD ( PC 1203.4 . Not Applicable
Judge: CHARLES E STAFFORD ( PC 1203.4 .
Get Document
May 03, 2019
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OR RULING RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEY RE: PC 1203.4 FILED. Not Applicable
Get Document
April 26, 2019
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF 1203.4 PETITION/ORDER ON DA WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/22/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT) Not Applicable
Get Document
April 26, 2019
Docket Event
PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4 FILED. Not Applicable
Get Document
April 26, 2019
Docket Event
HEARING RE: PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PC 1203.4/1203.4A (NON APPEARANCE) SET 5/20/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 3T.
Get Document
April 26, 2019
Docket Event
CRIMINAL CASE PURGED, THEREFORE PETITION FOR DISMISSAL/SEAL ARREST RECORD IS FILED IN THE CIVIL MODULE - CRIMINAL CASE #3661. Not Applicable
Get Document
April 26, 2019
Docket Event
PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4 Not Applicable
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.