Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dan Campbell, Janice Campbell, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Stone Dean Llp, against Eisenhower Inpatient Rehabilitation Center, Eisenhower Medicalcenter, Farjallah Khoury Md, Raj Sinha Md, Rancho Mirage Anesthesia Consultants Medica, (total of 9) See All represented by Agajanian Mcfall Weiss Tetreault & Crist, Creason Tucker Alexander Llp, Kramer Deboer & Keane, Prindle Goetz Barnes & Reinholtz, Unrepresented, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Carol A. Greene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE BY NOTICE/ACKNOWLEDGMENT SUBMITTED BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/26/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS STAR ORTHO
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/27/2018 OF JANICE CAMPBELL AND FILED.
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00FIRST PAPER FEE PAID AS TO FARJALLAH KHOURY MD (ON-LINE RESERVATION).
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY FARJALLAH KHOURY MD (ON-LINE RESERVATION).
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 03/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1 - RES85689.
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY REED SAUNDERS MD.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER SET FOR 3/01/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT PS1
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER AND FARJALLAH KHOURY.
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR 03/01/19 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EISENHOWER INPATIENT REHABILITATION CENTER
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 90 OF THE CRC JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS FILED
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00FILED: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CRC JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS FILED
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD.
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REED SAUNDERS MD, STEVEN RUBINSKY MD
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD.
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY REED SAUNDERS MD.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00FAX FILING BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY RANCHO MIRAGE ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS MEDICA.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00FILED: DEF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION OF GRANNIS IN RESP TO OSC RE SANCTIONS FILED
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00FAX FILING BY REED SAUNDERS MD ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PUR SECT 9 OF CRC FILED
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REPLY TO OPPOSITION SUBMITTED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/25/19
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 06/04/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1 - RES89577.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER SET FOR 6/04/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT PS1
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER AND FARJALLAH KHOURY.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL AND FILED.
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR 06/04/19 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:001ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY AMERICAN ECONOMY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR HEARING 05/09/19.
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/29/19
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00FAX FILING BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER AND FARJALLAH KHOURY.
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER SET FOR 9/03/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT PS1
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REED SAUNDERS MD, RANCHO MIRAGE ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS MEDICA
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFT
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:002ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 9/03/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 06/04/19.
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 7/10/19
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 09/03/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1 - RES92694.
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REED SAUNDERS MD, RANCHO MIRAGE ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS MEDICA
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANTS
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00NOTICE DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD FILED.
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEF EISENHOWER & KHOURY
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD.
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00HRDEM HEARING SET FOR 09/03/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: DUPLICATE
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8/14/19
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANT
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANT EISENHOWER
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 9/3/19.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 12/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1 - RES95103
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF STEVEN RUBINSKY.
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANTS
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER, FARJALLAH KHOURY MD FILED
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANT
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY STEVEN RUBINSKY FOR HEARING 12/05/19.
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR JUDGMENT BY STEVEN RUBINSKY FILED.
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD FILED
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REED SAUNDERS MD, RANCHO MIRAGE ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS MEDICA
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR 12/05/19 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00DECLARATION OF MICHAEL M KARSAZ ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD FOR HEARING 01/28/20.
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF STEVEN RUBINSKY.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 10/08/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT 01
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/08/19.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 01/28/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1 - RES95867.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF TAKING RES95867 OFF CALENDAR BY STEVEN RUBINSKY MD FILED.
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 1/30/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT PS1
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL FILED
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY JANICE CAMPBELL.
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 03/02/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1 - RES99042
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/5/19.
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO 3RD CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY BY JANICE CAMPBELL FILED.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFFS FOR HEARING 03/02/20.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS JANICE CAMPBELL AND DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MTN TO COMPEL SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 02.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANTS
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00170.6 CCP FILED BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC AGAINST JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER IS GRANTED.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 01 FOR ALL PURPOSES.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE CAROL A GREENE IN DEPARTMENT 02 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00FILED: TRIAL SETTING ORDER; JUDGE CAROL GREENE
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00TRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON 2/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01 - RESCHEDULED TO:.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF FARJALLAH KHOURY.
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 07/14/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 02 - RES101560.
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 07/13/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 02 - RES101559.
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 07/15/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 02 - RES101573.
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 4/20/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT 01
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER.
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF RAJ SINHA.
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 04/20/20.
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE SUBMITTED BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC.
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF FARJALLAH KHOURY.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 10/19/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00FILED: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 10/19/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 02 - RES205157.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY EISENHOWER MEDICAL CTR FOR HEARING 10/19/20.
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 10/20/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 02 - RES205177.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 10/20/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL BY FARJALLAH KHOURY MD FILED
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY EISENHOWER MED CTR FOR HEARING 10/20/20.
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00FILED: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FARJALLAH KHOURY MD
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 12/02/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 02 - RES206550.
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF RAJ SINHA.
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS JANICE CAMPBELL AND DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY RAJ SINHA MD FOR HEARING 12/02/20.
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FOR HEARING 09/23/20.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 09/14/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 02 - RES212185
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION TO COMPEL SET FOR 09/14/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00FILED: SEPARATE STATEMENT SUPPORTING MOTION TO COMPEL EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER TO FURTHER ANSWER
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JANICE CAMPBELL, DAN CAMPBELL
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00MOTION TO/FOR QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA BY JANICE CAMPBELL FILED
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 09/23/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 02 - RES211717
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00FILED: TRIAL SETTING ORDER;HONORABLE JUDGE CAROL A GREENE
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS JANICE CAMPBELL AND DAN CAMPBELL.
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET 12/15/20 AT 13:30 IN 12
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA BY JANICE CAMPBELL FILED.
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY DEFENDANT FILED
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00ASSIGN TO LEGAL RESEARCH ATTORNEY: MD
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: EX PARTE SET FOR 09/28/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFFS (RES225130/225132) FOR HEARING 09/28/20.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR EX PARTE HEARING SET 09/28/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 02 - RES225132.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00FILED: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATTERS ISO MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00DECLARATION OF WILLIAM E STONER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FILED
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 12/02/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00FILED: EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTERS SUPLLEMENTAL OPPO TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00FILED: COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENY BY DEF RAJSINHA MD & STAR ORTHO
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: MSJ/SEP STMT/POI RECEIVED ON 08/26/20 SUBMITTED BY RAJ SINHA MD, STAR ORTHOPEDIC INC.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00FILED: PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OFF CALENDAR BY JANICE CAMPBELL FILED.
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00ASSIGN TO LEGAL RESEARCH ATTORNEY: MD
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED FOR EX PARTE HEARING SET 09/28/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 02 - RES225130.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 09/14/20.
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00FILED: JOINT OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO POSTPONE THE HEARINGS RE MTNS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Having received no opposition and it appears to the satisfaction of the Court that the Motion was made pursuant to CCP 877.6(a)(1) and all parties were given notice of the motion and an opportunity to...
Judge: Carol Greene |
|
February 05, 2021 | Hearing | JURY TRIAL | |
December 15, 2020 | Hearing | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED) | |
December 15, 2020 | Hearing | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED) | |
December 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
As to Special Interrogatories 60-63 Special Interrogatories Nos. 60-63 seek information from defendant regarding the administration of “Midazolam (Versed)” on June 2, 2017, as “stated in the Medicatio...
Judge: Carol Greene |
|
December 07, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena is unopposed and is GRANTED.
Judge: Carol Greene |
|
December 04, 2020 | Hearing | HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER | |
December 04, 2020 | Hearing | HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER | |
December 04, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The evidence submitted in favor of the motion and in opposition must be admissible evidence. (Code Civ. Proc., § 437c(d).) While pleading ultimate facts or c...
Judge: Carol Greene |
|
December 03, 2020 | Hearing | HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JANICE CAMPBELL BY FARJALLAH KHOURY MD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.