Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anabel Guerrero Gutierrez, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against District Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Charles E. Stafford, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 14, 2017 |
CategoryPetn-For Dismissal Pursuant To Pc 1203.4/1203.4A&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Cycle Time39 days |
PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - PETITION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4A
Date: August 14, 2017PETITION/MOTION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO PC 1203.4A FILED.
Date: August 14, 2017MANUAL SUBSEQUENT 8715 COMPLETED.
Date: September 22, 2017REQUEST FOR DISPOSITION OR RULING RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEY RE: PC 1203.4 FILED.
Date: September 13, 2017MANUAL 8715 SENT TO DOJ.
Date: September 22, 2017RAP SHEET LODGED BY COURT.
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00ORDER FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED HONORABLE JUDGE CHARLES E STAFFORD ( PC 1203.4 .
Date: September 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.