Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coachella Cedar Springs Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kimball Tirey & Stjohn Llp, against Natalia Elizabeth Rivera, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Sarah A. Christian presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ps)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time197 days |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.
Date: July 16, 2015COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92236.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00--ALSO JUDGMENT ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS --
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY COACHELLA/CEDAR SPRINGS LP.
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; FULLY SATISFIED FILED.
Date: February 13, 2015HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/04/15 AT 8:00 IN CUD
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.
Date: April 22, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.