Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mercelyn Gonzalez, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Eisenberg & Associates, against Fountains Carlotta Sl Lp, Fountains Carlottasl Lp, Sunrise Senior Living Management Inc, Watermark Services Iv Llc, represented by Gordon & Rees, Gordon & Rees Llp, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time268 days |
Notice OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE by FOUNTAINS CARLOTTA SL LP filed.
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of GONZALEZ Naming Does 02 to be SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC filed.
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FOUNTAINS CARLOTTA SL LP
Date: 2014-06-13T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed.
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92211.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Notice of posting jury fees by MERCELYN GONZALEZ.
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MERCELYN GONZALEZ
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of GONZALEZ Naming Does 01 to be WATERMARK SERVICES IV LLC filed.
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92211.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MERCELYN GONZALEZ
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY MERCELYN GONZALEZ.
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MERCELYN GONZALEZ.
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FOUNTAINS CARLOTTASL LP
Date: 2014-06-13T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION
Date: August 18, 2014NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY FOUNTAINS CARLOTTASL LP FILED.
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.