Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Fernandez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryProbate Decedent'S Estates |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
First Supplement to the First and Final Account and Report of Personal Representative
Date: September 13, 2022Proposed Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Personal Representative
Date: August 15, 2022Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim
Date: June 21, 2022Rejection of Creditor's Claim (DE-174) in the Amount of $1,772.00
Date: February 03, 2022Allowance of Creditor's Claim in the Amount of $3,783.54
Date: February 03, 2022Inventory and Appraisal Corrected
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of proposed action.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Final. (DE-160/GC040)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Bond Posted in the Amount of $150,000.00
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Creditor's Claim for $3,783.54 from AscensionPoint Recovery Services, LLC, on behalf of Synchrony Bank
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Probate
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing JOSE A MEDINA
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Publication of NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Supplement to Petition for Probate
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Proposed Letters Submitted for the hearing date 01/12/2021
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF PEITITON TO ADMINISTER ESTATE OF LIDIA RUIZ
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00AMENDED AND CORRECTED Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Publication of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00First Supplement to Petition for Probate by Marta Marlene Carranza Morillo
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative. (DE-147)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Petition for Letters of Administration
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Confidential Statement of Birth Date and Driver's License
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proposed Order re: for Probate
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Creditor's Claim in the Amount of $1,772
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proposed Letters Submitted for the hearing date 11/25/2020
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Declaration of Marta Marlene Carranza Morillo Regarding Due Diligence to Ascertain and Provide Notice
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative. (DE-147)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment. (Probate)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.