Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delatorre, Jared Phillip filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Hoffman, Thomas Oliver, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryPetition Of Will And For Letters Of Admin W/ Will Annexed |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Filed Re:
Date: March 09, 2023Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Order Approving Final Accounting Filed
Date: February 16, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 02, 2023Proof of Holographic Will Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 30, 2021Int Petition for Probate of Will Letters of Administration
Date: September 30, 2021Receipt for Will Lodged
Date: October 12, 2021Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Proof of Publication re:
Date: October 21, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: December 01, 2021Letters Issued
Date: December 14, 2021Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Accounting Report Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Waiver Filed Re:
Date: December 20, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased ORDER |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Filed EX PARTE APPLICATION TO UNBLOCK ACCOUNT |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE AND URGENCY |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): MISSING ORDER RA-020 |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Final Accounting Filed ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING |
|
February 16, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Accounting Approved Waiver of Final Account and Petition for Final Distribution |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.