Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Foss, Frances I., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Approving Final Accounting Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Initial Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Ex Parte Petn for Final Discharge and Order Filed - Probate
Date: September 14, 2023Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 14, 2022Accounting Report Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Letters Issued
Date: October 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 21, 2021Proof of Publication re:
Date: October 06, 2021Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: December 29, 2021Inventory and Appraisal Not Filed- Hearing Set
Date: April 09, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Receipt Filed
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petn for Final Discharge and Order Filed - Probate | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed DISTRIBUTEE'S RECEIPT |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Approving Final Accounting Filed | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Accounting Approved Petition for Final Distribution |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
May 11, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report Filed PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT |
|
June 22, 2022 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed FINAL; PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.