Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gunderson, Judy Shinkle filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Damian Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition for final distribution and allowance of compensation in the estate of Judy Shinkle Gunderson. The petitioner is Corie Anna Pollock, the administrator of the estate. The petitioner was granted full authority to administer ...
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Petition for Letters of Special Administration Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Initial Pet for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary
Date: August 06, 2021Surety Bond Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Waiver Filed Re:
Date: March 27, 2023Waiver Filed Re:
Date: September 06, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 06, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Accounting Report Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Proof of Publication Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Receipt for Will Lodged
Date: August 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 06, 2021Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Letters Issued
Date: May 24, 2022Certificate & Order Vacating Docs Filed. Ntc Sent to Parties
Date: May 23, 2022Inventory and Appraisal Not Filed- Hearing Set
Date: September 29, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 02, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 29, 2023Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: January 31, 2022Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: March 09, 2022Letters Issued
Date: May 19, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 18, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 |
Department F1 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
September 07, 2023 |
Department F1 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
September 07, 2023 |
Department F1- Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver Filed Re: WAIVERS OF ACCOUNT |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: FURTHER DEC OF NICHOLAS D YONANO ESQ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR EXTRAORDINARY COMPENSATION |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION AND PET'S RESPONSE TO CALENDAR NOTES |
|
July 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.