Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Desrosiers, Janice Stevens, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Mann, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Waiver Filed Re:
Date: January 15, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 21, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 20, 2021Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: November 02, 2022Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Letters Issued
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: September 02, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Publication re:
Date: September 02, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 21, 2020Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: March 01, 2024Status Report Filed
Date: January 08, 2024Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: August 21, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 22, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 31, 2020Petition Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: March 06, 2024Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed FINAL SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service RETURN TO SENDER- REFUSED |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
January 11, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Report Filed | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
June 21, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed FINAL/ PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.