Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Morris Jr., Albert, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Proof of Service
Date: October 04, 2021Petition Filed
Date: October 29, 2019Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: October 29, 2019Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: December 18, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 29, 2019Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: December 18, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 11, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 21, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Holographic Will Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Letters Issued
Date: April 21, 2023Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: March 23, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 15, 2021Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: October 29, 2019Letters Issued
Date: December 18, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 17, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
May 24, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
October 05, 2022 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: EX PARTE REQUEST |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Filing Fee Waived for | |
October 06, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY | |
October 06, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Review Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY | |
October 06, 2021 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Reichert, Stanford E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.