Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daniel, Jennifer M, Giles, Jeffalyn, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Daniel, Jennifer M, Giles, Claude L, Public Administrator, Public Guardian, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Damian Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamian Garcia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: February 19, 2019Petition (Probate) Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Petition Filed
Date: February 14, 2019Status Report Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 03, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 07, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 14, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2019Remittitur Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: September 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Petition (Probate) Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Supplemental Filed (Imaged)
Date: June 07, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Objection Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: January 28, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 16, 2020Notice Filed re:
Date: October 22, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Objection Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: February 20, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: September 05, 2019Comment:
Date: April 29, 2020Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Notice Filed re:
Date: September 08, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Petition for Letters of Special Administration Filed
Date: February 14, 2019Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Ex Parte Petition
Date: November 29, 2022Return Mail
Date: August 03, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: January 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: June 02, 2022Motion
Date: February 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 21, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: February 28, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 13, 2022Motion
Date: December 08, 2020Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: June 28, 2021Allowance of Creditor's Claim Filed in the Amount of
Date: February 17, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 19, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 07, 2019Letters Issued
Date: February 25, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: January 04, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 27, 2020Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: August 31, 2020Letters Issued
Date: September 03, 2020Ntc of Entry of Default Filed and Fwd to the Court of Appeal
Date: December 31, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 31, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: April 26, 2021Comment:
Date: January 20, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 21, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: April 09, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 06, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 24, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 02, 2020Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: February 08, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 14, 2021Declaration re:
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 02, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 10, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 27, 2023Notice Filed re:
Date: October 22, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 18, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 15, 2019Proof of Publication re:
Date: February 14, 2022Document(s) Placed in File
Date: November 16, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: April 09, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 24, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: November 18, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 08, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 02, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 05, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Publication re:
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 09, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 02, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: March 11, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 02, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 07, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: February 10, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: April 26, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: March 15, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: April 29, 2020Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 27, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 08, 2019Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 28, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 16, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: February 26, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 07, 2021Document(s) Placed in File
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 |
Department F1- Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
August 24, 2023 |
Department F1- Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Mail NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Filed OF ADMINISTRATION |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased 1 - petition 8/29/19 |
|
May 18, 2023 |
Department F1- Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
May 18, 2023 |
Department F5 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.