Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ramsey, Patricia L, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition Filed
Date: June 02, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 05, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 04, 2023Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 20, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 11, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 31, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 17, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 17, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 28, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 25, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 07, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: October 20, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 16, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 09, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 29, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 15, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: June 30, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 24, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 02, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 29, 2016Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: June 02, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: April 25, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 22, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 15, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 07, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Nassar, William |
||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: reassignment |
|
April 25, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing Re: View Document Examiner Notes - 1st Check Judicial Officer Gilleece, Michelle Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment Status on related case (CONPS1600134) | |
September 28, 2021 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS RE: RELATED CASE (CONPS1600134) |
|
July 13, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment HEARING RE: STATUS RE: RELATED CASE (CONPS1600134) | |
July 13, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing Re: View Document Examiner Notes - 1st Check View Document **PR - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Gilleece, Michelle Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: STATUS RE: RELATED CASE (CONPS1600134) | |
July 13, 2021 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS RE: RELATED CASE (CONPS1600134) MICHELLE GILLEECE,JUDGE CLERK: SHANNON PRATT COURT REPORTER TAMOI TOMLINSON;13864 COURT ATTENDANT D RICE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY CRAIG PARKER PRESENT FOR EVELYN RUTH GEORGE. SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CRAIG PARKER FOR JACK OSBORN COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW HEARING HELD CONSERVATORSHIP ACCOUNTING REVIEW CONTINUED AS COUNSEL NEEDS ADDITIONAL TIME. THE COURT APPROVES ONE LAST CONTINUANCE. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/13/21 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S36P. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.