Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Lunk, Billie Gayle, filed a(n) Spousal Or Domestic Partner Property Petition case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A Ludvigsen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2015 |
CategorySpousal Or Domestic Partner Property Petition |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
This complaint is a supplement to a spousal property petition in the matter of the estate of Lawrence L Lunk, also known as Larry L Lunk. The attorney for the petitioner, Billie Gayle Lunk, submits this supplement to provide a list of names, relation...
Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition Filed
Date: March 18, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 17, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: March 27, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 27, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 24, 2015Property Tax Certification Filed
Date: March 18, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 18, 2015Supplemental Filed (Imaged)
Date: April 22, 2015Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order Filed
Date: April 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order Filed SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER. |
|
April 29, 2015 | Hearing | Fee Payment Comment FEE PAYMENT 150429-0361-CK MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 150429-0361-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 6550 | |
April 29, 2015 | Hearing | Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order Filed View Document SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER. Comment SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER. | |
April 29, 2015 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Ludvigsen, Cynthia A Comment SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING. CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JENNIFER MEDEIROS PRESENT FOR BILLIE LUNK. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION OF BILLIE GAYLE LUNK IS GRANTED ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION OF BILLIE GAYLE LUNK ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 29, 2015 | Hearing | Petition Hearing Original Type Petition Hearing Judicial Officer Ludvigsen, Cynthia A Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING. | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 150429-0361-CK MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 150429-0361-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 6550 | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING. CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JENNIFER MEDEIROS PRESENT FOR BILLIE LUNK. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION OF BILLIE GAYLE LUNK IS GRANTED ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION OF BILLIE GAYLE LUNK ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING. CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JENNIFER MEDEIROS PRESENT FOR BILLIE LUNK. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) |
|
April 29, 2015 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Probate Notes - Hearing Date of HRG OF 04/29/15 - PROBATE NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.