Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Succession of Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Reilly, Tara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategoryPetition To Determine Succession To Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeSuccession of Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2013 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Reilly, Tara Comment PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY TARA REILLY,JUDGE CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS;7776 BAILIFF: P BARRIE - APPEARANCES: LEONARD OLSON PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY OF LEONARD W OLSON IS GRANTED ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. - COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY OF LEONARD W OLSON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) - ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
June 27, 2013 | Hearing | Filing Fee Paid by Comment FILING FEE PAID BY LEONARD W OLSON FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER 130627-3870-VS MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 0.50 PAYMT 130627-3870-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 024-0169980747 | |
June 27, 2013 | Hearing | Order Determining Succession to Real Property Filed View Document ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILE View Document ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILE View Document ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILE Comment ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. | |
June 27, 2013 | Hearing | Petition Hearing Original Type Petition Hearing Judicial Officer Reilly, Tara Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY | |
June 13, 2013 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing View Document NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06-27-2013 FILED. Comment NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/27/2013 FILED. | |
June 13, 2013 | Hearing | Amended Document Filed re: View Document AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL P Comment AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED) | |
June 13, 2013 | Hearing | Inventory & Appraisal Filed View Document INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL- FINAL FILED. Comment INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL FILED. | |
May 15, 2013 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Reilly, Tara Comment PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY TARA REILLY,JUDGE CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS;7776 BAILIFF: P BARRIE - APPEARANCES: LEONARD OLSON PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) - HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT. REASON: TO CLEAR NOTES - PETITIONER GIVEN A COPY OF EMAIL FROM D SILLIMAN TO ASSIST IN CLEARING NOTES. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/27/13 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S8P. - ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 15, 2013 | Hearing | Petition Hearing Original Type Petition Hearing Judicial Officer Reilly, Tara Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY | |
April 12, 2013 | Hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S8P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.