Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Johnson, Hope Marie, Maxwell, Linda, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2007 |
CategoryPetition Regarding Trusts |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Supplemental Filed (Imaged)
Date: September 22, 2020Accounting Report Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Petition For:
Date: October 13, 2023Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Petition Filed
Date: February 22, 2012Supplemental Filed (Imaged)
Date: September 28, 2015Notice Filed re:
Date: August 22, 2013Accounting Report Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Accounting Report Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Supplemental Filed (Imaged)
Date: January 16, 2014Notice of Hearing
Date: August 14, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 23, 2012Accounting Report Filed
Date: May 27, 2011Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 23, 2019Accouting and Supporting Documents Filed
Date: August 05, 2010Order Filed Re:
Date: March 27, 2012Receipt Filed
Date: February 24, 2014Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Receipt for Final Distribution Received Filed
Date: February 24, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 18, 2018Accounting Report Filed
Date: July 24, 2012Order Filed Re:
Date: September 06, 2019Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: July 07, 2011Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 07, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: September 11, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 03, 2020Imaged Documents Filed prior to 12/31/1995
Date: August 19, 2010Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 27, 2011Notice Imaged
Date: August 05, 2016Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: February 27, 2012Notice Sent re:
Date: December 29, 2010Notice Sent re:
Date: May 03, 2013Petition Filed
Date: July 10, 2019Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: September 11, 2017Receipt Filed
Date: August 07, 2018Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 18, 2015Accounting Report Filed
Date: August 27, 2015Receipt Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 02, 2019Notice Filed re:
Date: April 04, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: August 30, 2012Petition For:
Date: December 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 27, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 28, 2017Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: October 15, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 26, 2018Surety Bond Issued
Date: September 06, 2012Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 24, 2020Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: June 21, 2018Comment:
Date: September 17, 2012Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 01, 2012Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 07, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 22, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 23, 2019Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: January 23, 2014Receipt Filed
Date: November 10, 2015Receipt Filed
Date: July 13, 2011Receipt Filed
Date: July 13, 2011Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 16, 2020Surety Bond Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2013Accounting Report Filed
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 17, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: May 17, 2018Receipt Filed
Date: August 07, 2018Receipt Filed
Date: September 17, 2012Receipt Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Accounting Report Filed
Date: December 06, 2013Receipt Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Surety Bond Issued
Date: October 02, 2020Receipt Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 03, 2020Receipt Filed
Date: April 13, 2012Notice Sent re:
Date: November 08, 2012Declaration Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 05, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 23, 2014Receipt Filed
Date: November 10, 2015Notice of Court Action Mailed to Defendant
Date: May 22, 2012Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: June 06, 2011Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 14, 2019Receipt Filed
Date: September 17, 2012Order Filed Re:
Date: September 22, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 08, 2015Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
January 16, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed HRG 7/10/2024 |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition For: AMENDMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING RESIGNATION OF TRUSTEE & FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report Filed 11TH AND FINAL ACCOUNT |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING RESIGNATION OF TRUSTEE |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition For: FOR ORDER ACCEPTING RESIGNATION |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Surety Bond Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.