Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robert A Falco, Charles R. Hoge, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Hoge & Hubanks, against Robert A Falco, Marcella Folkers, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2001 |
CategoryProbate Of Will |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISCHARGING TRUSTEE AND EXONERATING SURETY ON BOND Not Applicable |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF OF FURTHER ACCOUNTING BY LAVERNE FOLKERS WALSH FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF FURTHER ACCOUNTING BY LORRAYN FOLKERS MILLER FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISCHARGING TRUSTEE AND EXONERATING SURETY ON BOND FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF FURTHER ACCOUNTING BY ARC/INDEPENDENT WAY FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: AFFIRMATION OF FINAL DISCHARGE OF TRUSTEE FILED ON 03/28/05 BY ROBERT A FALCO - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON HRG RE ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FBO L F WALSH FILED (D61, 05/19/05, @9:00AM) Not Applicable |
|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
(PROBATE) PROOF OF MAIL SERVICE OF NTC OF HRG ON SEE LIST ON 04/07/05 Not Applicable |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF ROBERT FALCO FILED RE: FINAL DISCHARGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | HEARING WAS SET FOR 5/19/05 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 61 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.