Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patricia A Stephenson, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case against Michael K Stephenson, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with David E. Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySpousal Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
MICHAEL K. STEPHENSON WILL EXECUTED ON 06/30/14 LODGED Not Applicable Judge: David E. Goldstein |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
SPOUSAL PROPERTY ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED ON 12/29/17 BY PATRICIA A STEPHENSON - Minutes GRANTED Judge: Charles S. Treat |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION F ILED Not Applicable |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON SPOUSAL PROP PTN FILED W/PRF OF MLG ON 2-1-18 SEE SVC LIST Not Applicable Judge: Anita L. Santos |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
HEARING WAS SET FOR 2/27/18 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS GREY Not Applicable |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.