Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Debra Flork filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Marilyn Joan Talken, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2013 |
CategoryLetter - No Will |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION BY DEBRA FLORK Not Applicable |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION BY MICHAEL TALKEN Not Applicable |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTION BY JOSEPH TALKEN Not Applicable |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CORRECT MATHEMATICAL ERROR FILED BY DEBRA FLORK Not Applicable |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT, ALLOWING COMPENSATION, RESERVE FILED BY DEBRA FLORK Not Applicable |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVEROF ACCT, FIX NG & ALLOWING COMPENSATION & REIMBURSEMENT Not Applicable |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
FEE RECEIVED FOR EX PARTE PTN FOR FNL DISTRIBUTION FROM DEBRA FLORK Not Applicable |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCT & EX PARTE PTN FOR FNL DI STRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF NTC; FOR COMPENSATION Not Applicable |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - FINAL FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.