Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mary D. Martinez filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Gabriel V Avalos, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Joyce M. Cram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoyce M. Cram Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2011 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions536 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time225 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RE: PETITIONER TO TERMINAT VISITATION Not Applicable |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
FEE COLLECTED FOR SALE OF SMALL PREPAID ENVELOPE Not Applicable |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PETITION TO TERMINATE VISITATION FILED ON 08/29/11 BY SALLY AVALOS - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PETITION TO TERMINATE VISITATION FILED ON 08/29/11 BY SALLY AVALOS - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PETITION TO TERMINATE VISITATION FILED ON 08/29/11 BY SALLY AVALOS - Minutes Complete |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEC OF MARY MARTINEZ FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PTN TO TERMINATE FILED W/PRF OF MLG ON 9-14-11 SEE SVC LIST Not Applicable |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF MARY MARTINEZ RE VISITATION FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING WAS FOR 10/14/11 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 14 | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUBSEQUENT PETITION TERMINATE VISITATION FILED BY SALLY AVALOS Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.