Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, David A. filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Holly Celeste Montgomery, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryLetter - No Will |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1830 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 61 TO 14. Not Applicable |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 14 TO 61. Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 61 TO 14. Not Applicable |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION & ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FROM DONNA MONTGOMERY FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FROM RICHARD HEFNER FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FROM DAVID A BROWN FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: 1ST & FINAL REPORT & PTN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED ON 06/22/06 BY DONNA L MONTGOMERY - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ACCOUNT AND ACCOUNT AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTY OF RECORD FILED ON BEHALF OF DONNA L MONTGOMERY Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.