Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deborah Lane filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 03, 2005 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2195 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time1182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 61 TO 14. Not Applicable |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 14 TO 61. Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 61 TO 14. Not Applicable |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO BE RELIEVED AS MINORS COUNSEL, CORRESPONDING ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUSAN AGLIETTI REMOVED AS AN ATTORNEY ON THIS CASE Not Applicable |
|
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
COURT INVESTIGATION ASSESSMENT FOR GUARDIANSHIP PAID BY DEBORAH LANE IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 Not Applicable |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PETN FOR APPTMENT OF GUARDIAN FILED ON 12/30/04 BY DEBORAH LANE - Minutes GRANTED |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP ISSUED/FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR OF PERSON FILED, NO BOND REQUIRED, ORDER EXPIRES: UPON FURTHER COURT ORDER Not Applicable |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.