Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marie Pacheco, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Falco, Robert A., against Michael Ben Pacheco, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Steven K. Austin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
CategoryC'Torship Pers And Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER RE COURT INVESTIGATOR FEE Not Applicable |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF RANDOLPH STEIN, COURT APPTD COUNSEL APPR OVING 37TH ACCT Not Applicable |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR APPROVAL OF 37TH ACCT & APPROVAL OF FEES FILED ON 04/30/19 BY BARBARA RIGGIO - Minutes GRANTED Judge: Mary Ann O'Malley |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING THIRTY-SEVENTH ACCOUNT AND APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND TRUSTEE COMPENSATION FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CAROLYN CAIN AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF AARON R FELDMAN IN RESPONSE TO EXAMINERS NOTES FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR APPROVAL OF 37TH ACCNT & APPROVAL OF FEES FILED ON 04/30/19 BY BARBARA RIGGIO - Minutes COMPLETED Judge: Mary Ann O'Malley |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF AARON R FELDMAN FILED RE: IN RESPONSE TO EXAMINERS NOTES Not Applicable |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER THAT THE CONSERVATEES ESTATE BE ASSESSED FOR THE COURT INVESTIGATORS SERVICES FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR APPROVAL OF 37TH ACCT & APPROVAL OF FEES FILED ON 04/30/19 BY BARBARA RIGGIO - Minutes Complete Judge: Mary Ann O'Malley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.