Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... | |
January 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... | |
January 29, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... | |
January 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... | |
January 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... | |
January 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... | |
January 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 01/25/23 TIME: 8:30 A.M. DEPT: H CASE NO: PRO2203689 PRESIDING: HON. VERNA A. ADAMS REPORTER: CLERK: STACY BOND. GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON: GLORIA ESMERALDA RODRIGUEZ VELIS NATURE OF PROCEEDING... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.