Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with John G. Evans presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryProbate Trust |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Request for Dismissal
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Entry of Order Granting Petition to Approve Settlement
Date: May 25, 2022Non-Filed Document Request for Dismissal
Date: May 24, 2022Proof of Service re: Requests for Dismissal Served by US Mail on 5/24/2022
Date: May 24, 2022Order to Deposit Funds In Blocked Account $154,750.00 as to Ryan Simon
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Order Approving Settlement Agreement
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Order Approving Settlement Agreement Submitted for hearing date 5/20/2022
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing on Subsequent Miscellaneous Petition filed by DOROTHY SIMON, DONNA SIMON
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Order on Petitioners' Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date of Petition....
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Order on Petitioners' Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date of Petition.....
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3) 4/4/2022
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3) 06/13/2022
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Subsequent Miscellaneous Probate Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition for Trust filed by DOROTHY SIMON, DONNA SIMON
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing See Attached Service List
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Supplement to Petition to Invalidate Trust Amendment
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Respondent Armando Alvarez's Verified Answer to Petition to Invalidate Trust Amendment
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing re: Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Order Granting Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Submitted for hearing 3/24/2021
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address and Firm Name
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition for Trust filed by DOROTHY SIMON, DONNA SIMON
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Respondent Lupita Brassea's Verified Answer to Petition to Invalidate Trust Amendment
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Respondent Dianne Campbell's Verified Answer to Petition to Invalidate Trust Amendment
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing on Subsequent Miscellaneous Petition filed by
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment. (Probate)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Subsequent Miscellaneous Probate Petition for Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem-Probate
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Petition to Invalidate Trust Amendment Served by Mail on 11/5/2020
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Petition for Trust re: Petition to Invalidate Trust Amendment
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.