Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robinson, Jacquetta Jean, Robinson, Jimmy Vern, Robinson, Joseph Chris, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2008 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time2200 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Records imaged | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Copies | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Certified copy | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | First Paper Filed - Fee | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.