Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ruiz, Moana, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Petre, Donna M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePetre, Donna M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2024 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2025 | Docket Event |
Annual Review
Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Guardianship Judge: Brown, Danette C. |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance all parties |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Consent of Guardian FILED BY MOANA RUIZ |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED WILLIAM STARCK BY MAIL WITH DECL AND ATTACHMENTS FILED 02/27/24 ON 02/28/24 |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Investigative Report FILED BY HHSA |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER, MOANA RUIZ |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) TO APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND WAIVER OF NOTICE SIGNED BY DONALD VANDEBERG |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) TO APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AND WAIVER OF NOTICE SIGNED BY THERESAE DAMOTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.