Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Halbach, Marci, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2024 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2025 | Docket Event |
Annual Review
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Conservatorship Review of Person Only Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance -- Attorney Daphne Xiao |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Conservatorship Review of Person Only Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by Atty Xiao |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Public Defender Appointed Atty Xiao to provide all documents to the public defender. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED; FOR HRG ON 2/22/24; SERVED BY MAIL ON 1/08/24 TO SUSAN KELLY, DAN KELLY, ALTA REGIONAL, TAYLOR SEE AND SERVED BY MAIL TO JAYDEN HENRY HENSON ON 1/16/24 |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Citation FILED; FOR HRG ON 2/22/2024; PERSONALLY SERVED JAYDEN HENRY HENSON ON 1/16/24. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration CAPACITY DECLARATION BY THOMAS MARCH, MD. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.