Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Crandall, Janna Caron, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2024 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court (3 Day Est) Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
August 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Motion to Consolidate
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Hearing - Setting of Evidentiary Hearing Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To CAL SHELF |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Hearing PROBATE Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted Oral Motion to Consolidate |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents PROPOSED ORDER |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
ANSWER/RESPONSE/DENIAL INTERVENTION RESPONDENT BRADFORD G. CRANDALL JR.S ANSWER TO PETITION (1) TO COMPEL BRADFORD G. CRANDALL JR. TO ACCOUNT |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED JANNA CARIE CRANDALL WITH RESPONDENT BRADFORD G. CRANDALL JRS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; DECLARATION OF KENDALL A. CHIDLAW IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT BRADFORD G. CRANDALL JRS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; PROPOSED ORDER ON 2/15/2024 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.