Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Plumas County. This case was filed in Plumas County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2015 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlumas County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | PR15-00038 Guardianship of McArthur-Settell, Chritopher & Douglas Tentative Ruling: No appearance required. The Court has received and reviewed the Confidential Guardianship Status Report. The Court f... | |
May 30, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: No appearance required. The Court has received and reviewed the Confidential Guardianship Status Report. The Court finds it is in the minor’s best interests to continue the guardians...
Judge: Janet Hilde |
|
May 22, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: No appearance required. The court has received and reviewed the confidential guardianship status report. The court finds it is in the minors’ best interests to continue guardianship....
Judge: Janet Hilde |
|
May 23, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: No appearance required. The court has received the confidential guardianship status report, and finds that continued guardianship is in the best interests of the minors. The court sc...
Judge: Janet Hilde |
|
November 23, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. The court has received the investigator’s report, and intends to follow the recommendation, granting guardianship.
Judge: Janet Hilde |
|
October 14, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
Tentative Ruling: Appearance required. The court has not received the investigator’s report.
Judge: Janet Hilde |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.