Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Silva, Thomas W filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Change of Address
Date: April 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed September 1, 2022, which the Court has read and considered, the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information sheet is due by September 5, 2023 with a review hearing on October 17, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Re. Cost Assessment and Right to Object | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Investigator Conservatorship Review Report | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Investigator's Information Sheet | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order Continuing Conservatorship |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Continuing Conservatorship
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.