Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte Co Public Guardian filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Glusman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time1484 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person & Estate Final Discharge Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petn for Final Discharge & Order - G'ship or C'ship | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt For County Counsel Fees |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt For Public Guardian Fees |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Declaration & Order Re: Investigation Assessment |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Accounting Hearing final accounting Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Settling Third & Final Account & Report of Public Guardian; & Order Granting Fees Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Investigation-Subsequent | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation Fees ordered in the reduced amount of $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.