Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Below, Amy filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time407 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING - ANNUAL Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: TAM Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Discharge EX PARTE PETN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE & ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MKI |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING DECL & ORD RE INVESTIGATION ASSESSMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAM |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTLING 1ST & FINAL ACCT & RPT OF C'TOR; FEES AND DISTRIBUTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAM | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING-SIX MONTH Desc2: *CONT FROM 6/13/13 FOR FINAL ACCTG Desc3: *CONSERVATEE PASSED AWAY; NEED DEATH CER Disp Code: 342 - HEARD; ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TAM Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation DECL & ORDER RE C'TORSHIP INVEST ASSESS - ORDERED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAM |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR BANK RECORDS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TAM | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Desc: 1ST & FINAL ACCTG, CTOR/GDN, FEES Desc3: VACATE 12-12-13 REVIEW Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: TAM Filing Clerk: MKI Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Investigative Report ANNUAL INVESTIGATOR'S REPORT RE CONSERVATORSHIP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MKI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.